Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Donald E. Shaver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald E. Shaver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2003 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Warrant Return
Date: March 26, 2019Review: Contempt
Date: June 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex-Parte Application | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Warrant Return Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.