Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Donald E. Shaver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald E. Shaver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2006 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Warrant Return
Date: May 01, 2018Return on Bench Warrant
Date: July 25, 2017Warrant Return
Date: February 11, 2020Review: Contempt
Date: June 01, 2018Review: Contempt
Date: May 08, 2018Warrant Return
Date: October 16, 2018Warrant Return
Date: September 04, 2018Warrant Return
Date: April 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Warrant Return
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Short Form Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Warrant Return Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.