Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shelly A. Seymour presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: Corman, Gerald |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Finding and Order After Hearing | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Corman, Gerald |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.