Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shelly A. Seymour presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelly A. Seymour Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 1997 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Warrant Return
Date: June 27, 2017Review: Contempt
Date: October 24, 2017Ex-Parte Application
Date: June 02, 2017Review: Seek Work
Date: May 26, 2017Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Date: March 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause: Seek Work Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.