Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shelly A. Seymour presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 1994 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Department Child Support Services Support Calculations | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
* Public * Notice of Motion |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Income and Expense Declaration |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: Corman, Gerald |
|
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.