Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with David A. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Foster Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: June 05, 2018Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: January 16, 2018Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: November 28, 2017Pre-Trial Conference
Date: July 24, 2018Application and Order for Reissuance
Date: November 27, 2017Review: Contempt
Date: December 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Foster, David |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Foster, David |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.