Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeymour, Shelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 1993 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: October 17, 2017Review: Contempt
Date: February 06, 2018Order Show Cause: Contempt
Date: June 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Review: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause: Contempt Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.