Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Gerald W. Corman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Confidential Historical Documents | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Corman, Gerald |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause: Seek Work
Judge: Corman, Gerald |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.