Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sintay Gina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sintay Brian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael S. Mink presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2002 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice (of change of address. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sintay, Gina ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice (of change of address. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sintay, Gina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Sintay, Brian ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
May 27, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Sintay, Brian ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | |
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sintay, Gina ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sintay, Gina ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 17, 2005 | Hearing |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sintay, Gina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 17, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sintay, Gina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.