Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wetterau Cynthia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Goldman Karen Lee, against Yadgari Hanri A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 1999 | Hearing |
Order (STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC REL ATIONS ORDER - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wetterau, Cynthia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 15, 1998 | Hearing |
Stipulation (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wetterau, Cynthia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 15, 1998 | Hearing |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wetterau, Cynthia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 26, 1998 | Hearing |
Declaration (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Yadgari, Hanri ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 26, 1998 | Hearing |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wetterau, Cynthia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 26, 1998 | Hearing |
Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wetterau, Cynthia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 26, 1998 | Hearing |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wetterau, Cynthia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 22, 1998 | Hearing |
Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wetterau, Cynthia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 31, 1997 | Docket Event | Petition - Family Law Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.