Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Moshe Yair, Moshe Yair Ben An Individual, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by A. Scott Brown, Brown Aaron S., against Lew Uzrad, Lew Uzrad An Individual, represented by Grigoryan Hayk M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale Courthouse with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management319 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions576 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseGlendale Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Case Assignment -
Date: July 30, 2018Complaint -
Date: July 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of OSC -
Date: July 30, 2018Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 19, 2018Minute Order - (Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Comply...)
Date: October 16, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service of Summons
Date: October 25, 2018Answer
Date: November 21, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 29, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: November 30, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 24, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Service and Sanctions pursuant to...)
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 02, 2019Application - Application Application for Writ of Attachement
Date: January 29, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order to Continue Plainti...)
Date: February 21, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 19, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
Date: March 19, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RE: RFA
Date: March 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS
Date: March 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 23, 2019Separate Statement
Date: October 21, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: October 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY; 2) ORDER TO SHO...)
Date: December 10, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 11, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION RE OSC
Date: December 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MSJ
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER FOR MINUTE ORDER 12/10/2019 FOR DEPARTMENT D)
Date: December 18, 2019Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 21, 2020Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF YAIR BEN MOSHE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 13, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: February 26, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 17, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: March 17, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 27, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: June 30, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 30, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: June 07, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )
Date: June 09, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Motions)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/02/2019)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (of Summons)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Comply...))
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel re: RFA)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion to Continue Plaintiff's Application for Pre-Judgment Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Application for Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Application (for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment; Memo of Points and Authorities in support of;)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order to Continue Plainti...))
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: re: Service and Sanctions pursuant to...))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel further responses to Request to production of documents)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel further responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Compelling Responses and Producti...))
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of A. Scott Brown in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Mediation and Discovery))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Declaration (re OSC)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudicatio...))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (to MSJ)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to CACC Section ...))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Order ([proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Yair Ben Moshe's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Continuing Civil, Tria...))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Mediation and Discovery; 2) Order to Sho...))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of YAIR BEN MOSHE in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Uzrad Lew filed in Support of Oppostion to MSJ)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order for Minute Order 12/10/2019 for Department D))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Judgment (on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Reply (Errata to Declaration of Yair Ben Moshe in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Judgment ([Proposed] Amended Judgment)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.