Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alvernaz Partners Llc A California Limited Liability Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Hunter Aileen Marie, against Alvernaz Partners Llc, First Republic Bank, Luu Thanh Thu, Out West Resources Llc, represented by Arshonsky Richard Ian, Coe Lisa Anne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with William D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management150 days |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2018 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Conditional Settlement) |
Case Cycle Time288 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 21, 2018Summons
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: May 21, 2018Request For Copies
Date: June 12, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: May 21, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons
Date: June 18, 2018Affidavit
Date: June 18, 2018Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -
Date: July 18, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: August 06, 2018Amended Complaint -
Date: August 13, 2018Answer - PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2018Cross-Complaint -
Date: August 21, 2018Summons - CROSS- COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2018Notice - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT -CIVIL
Date: August 23, 2018Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -
Date: August 29, 2018Answer - TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2018Proof of Personal Service -
Date: September 18, 2018Proof of Personal Service -
Date: August 30, 2018Answer -
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: September 28, 2018Proof of Service - No Service -
Date: September 28, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: October 02, 2018Application for Publication -
Date: October 03, 2018Legacy Document -
Date: October 03, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: October 03, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment -
Date: October 05, 2018Order for Publication -
Date: October 16, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: October 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 18, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: November 20, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: January 16, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Case Management)
Date: January 28, 2019Notice - Notice of Courts January 28, 2019 Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2019Judgment - Judgment Quiet Title
Date: February 19, 2019Stipulation and Order - Stipulation for Entry of Judgment; Order Thereon
Date: February 19, 2019Notice - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order- Judgment to Quiet Title
Date: February 22, 2019Notice - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order - Stipulation for Entry of Judgment Order Thereon
Date: February 22, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 26, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2019Request For Copies
Date: February 28, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Settlement)
Date: March 05, 2019Cross-Complaint fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order - Stipulation for Entry of Judgment Order Thereon)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order- Judgment to Quiet Title)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2019Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00DECLARATION OF ALFREDO NAVARRO OF CROSS COMPLAINANT ALVERNAZ PARTNERS LLC APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Case Management))
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Settlement))
Date: March 05, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Notice (of Courts January 28, 2019 Minute Order)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: February 28, 2019Order for Publication
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Judgment Quiet Title
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Entry of Judgment; [Proposed] Order Thereon)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.