Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vasquez Ancelmo Ramos, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 Llc, Mtc Financial Inc. Dba Trustee Corps, represented by Dettelbach Alan M., Reynolds Richard J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions163 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Opposition
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 02, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: April 06, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 16, 2018Opposition
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Order
Date: March 16, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: March 27, 2018Judgment
Date: March 29, 2018Notice
Date: April 03, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.