Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Christopher Garcia, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nardoni Silvio F. Jr, against Lee William S.C., represented by Dell Louis P., Sandoval Alisa Estella, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with William D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 09, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions592 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeArbitration Award |
Case Cycle Time589 days |
Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Attorney; As to: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Document:Petition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Motion for Appointment of Post-Judgment Receiver; Filed by: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00of OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Silvio F. Nardoni, Jr (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request For Copies of Entire File; Filed by:
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Silvio F. Nardoni, Jr (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Request to Reschedule Hearing; Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Defendant); Charge Fee ?: YES
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Reply in support of petition to confirm arbitration award; Filed by: Garcia Christopher (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by: Attorney; As to: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by:
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Petition; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Oath of Receiver; Filed by: Eric P. Beatty (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Opposition to petition to confirm arbitrator's award; Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER; Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing; Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Undertaking Under Section 567 b CCP; Filed by:
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Opposition to Motion For Instructions; Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Continue Hearing Filed by Def...)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE; Filed by: Eric P. Beatty (Non-Party); As to: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: March 08, 2019Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 12, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: February 06, 2019Motion for Order - MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER
Date: August 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: March 08, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER
Date: September 24, 2021Motion re: - MOTION RE: CORRECT CLERICAL MISTAKE IN JUDGMENT OF SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE
Date: September 27, 2021Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER
Date: September 28, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ADVANCE AND CONTINUE MOTION HEARING
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID LIGTENBERG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER
Date: November 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION SUPPLEMENTAL TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER
Date: November 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER CORRECTING CLERICAL MISTAKE IN JU...)
Date: December 03, 2021Brief - STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 08, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 25, 2022Reply - REPLY OF THE RECEIVER IN SUPPORT OF THE RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 29, 2022Other - - COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 09, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: April 28, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT - CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION
Date: June 15, 2017Other - - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 20, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 13, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2022Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Silvio Nardoni in Support of Motion to Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Defendant's Request to Reschedule Hearing) of )
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Notice (of OSC-Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Reply (of the Receiver in Support of the Receiver's Motion for Instructions)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Correcting clerical mistake in ju...))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance and continue hearing))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Motion re: (Correct Clerical Mistake in Judgment of Specific Performance)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Advance and continue Motion hearing)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Opposition to Correct Clerical Mistake in Judgment)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Request for Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Appoint a Receiver)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion For Instructions)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Defendant's Request to Reschedule Hearing))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Continue Hearing)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Request (to Reschedule Hearing)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of David Ligtenberg in Support of Motion for Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order (Appointing Receiver in Aid of Enforcement of Judgment)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Statement of Non-Opposition to Receiver's Motion for Instructions
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Oath of Receiver
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL MISTAKE IN JUDGMENT OF SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice (of Filing of the Receiver's Undertaking)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Garcia in Support of Motion to Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Reply (in support of petition to confirm arbitration award)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Continue Hearing Filed by Def...))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric P. Beatty in Support of Motion for Appointment of Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (ISO Mtn for Appt of a Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING ON PEITITON TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric P. Beatty in Support of Motion for Appointment of Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Garcia in Support of Motion to Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Defendant's Request to Reschedule Hearing) of 09/17/2021)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (to petition to confirm arbitrator's award)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Reply (in support of petition to confirm arbitration award)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Request (to Reschedule Hearing)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Silvio Nardoni in Support of Motion to Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Request for Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Appoint a Receiver)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Defendant's Request to Reschedule Hearing))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Order (Appointing Receiver in Aid of Enforcement of Judgment)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Correcting clerical mistake in ju...))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Motion re: (Correct Clerical Mistake in Judgment of Specific Performance)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL MISTAKE IN JUDGMENT OF SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Continue Hearing)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance and continue hearing))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Advance and continue Motion hearing)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Opposition to Correct Clerical Mistake in Judgment)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVER)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice (of Filing of the Receiver's Undertaking)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (ISO Mtn for Appt of a Post-Judgment Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Declaration (of David Ligtenberg in Support of Motion for Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: William S.C. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT for Rescission; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Garcia Christopher (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT (for Rescission)
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Motion for Appointment of Post-Judgment Receiver
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice (OF RECORDING AND NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION)
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING ON PEITITON TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF LEN SCHAUSTAL ISO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (to petition to confirm arbitrator's award)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Notice (of OSC-Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT (for Rescission)
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Notice (OF RECORDING AND NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION)
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF LEN SCHAUSTAL ISO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.