Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gallardo Cisto, Peraza Myrna As Administrator, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Law Jerrie S. Weiss, against Care Vitas Innovatice Hospice, Evergreen Senior Care Inc., Tan Peter X. M.D., represented by Morris Polich & Purdy Llp, Warford Stockalper & Moore Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Donna Fields Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management150 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time444 days |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 26, 2017Opposition
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: November 13, 2017Declaration
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Application
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: September 25, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.