Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diagnostic Laboratories, Kan-Di-Ki Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Day Jones, Latham & Watkins Llp, against Edgewater Health Care Inc., North American Health Care Inc., Edgewater Skilled Nursing Center, represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp, Pc Theodora Oringher, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Donna Fields Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Fields Goldstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management150 days |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time574 days |
Notice
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Statement
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 23, 2017Reply
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 25, 2017Motion
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 25, 2017Notice
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 10, 2017Declaration
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 03, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.