Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael & Associates Pc, against Tikriti Basil, Tikriti Basil A., Tikriti Basil S., Tikriti Basil Safa, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale Courthouse with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management217 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial578 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions554 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseGlendale Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time554 days |
Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION
Date: November 17, 2016Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC HEARING )
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRIAN P. MCGURK RE STATUS OF SUBMITTING PROOF OF SERVICE )
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Notice (OSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TRIAL COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT HEARING )
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (NON SERVICE REPORT )
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Summons Filed (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (NON SERVICE REPORT )
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRIAN P. MCGURK RE STATUS OF SUBMITTING PROOF OF SERVICE )
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Trial
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Stipulation (FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; )
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 04, 2019Judgment (Proposed Judgment Pursuant to CCP 664.6)
Date: October 04, 2019Notice of Trial
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 18, 2019Motion re: (Motion for Order Vacating Dismissal and Entering Judgment Pursuant to CCP 664.6)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: March 12, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 12, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.