Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Griffin Dennis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Glazer & Blinder, against Petech Anthony, represented by Thomas O'Hagan & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale Courthouse with Laura A. Matz presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 08, 2006 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseGlendale Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time417 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department E Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Dennis Griffin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Dennis Griffin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding Order to Show Cause (REGARDING DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OFSETTLEMENT) - Continued Judge: Laura A. Matz |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department E (Order to Show Cause; Continued) - |
|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department E Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department E Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department D CRASH Settlement Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.