Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Poladian David, Ulloa Adela, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mancini & Associates, against Avalon At Media Center, Avalonbay Communities Inc., represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dickr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle R. Rosenblatt presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2006 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time349 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department A Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department A Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department A Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NCBA, Michelle R. Rosenblatt, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL) - Hearing Prev. Advanced and Vacated Judge: Michelle R. Rosenblatt |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Adela Ulloa (Plaintiff); David Poladian (Plaintiff) |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Avalon at Media Center (Defendant); Avalonbay Communities, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NCBA, Michelle R. Rosenblatt, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED)) - Continued by Court Judge: Michelle R. Rosenblatt |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department A (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Court) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.