Arabella Lux Scheuffele
filed a(n)
Domestic Violence -
Family
case
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
with Gregory Olson presiding.
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge (FL016)
January 27, 2022
Docket Event
Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS) (DV-130) Expires on: 01/26/2027 on Domestic Violence Without Child(ren) filed by ARABELLA LUX SCHEUFFELE on 01/13/2022
January 20, 2022
Docket Event
Proof of Personal Service (CLETS) (DV-200) on Domestic Violence Without Child(ren) filed by ARABELLA LUX SCHEUFFELE on 01/13/2022
January 13, 2022
Docket Event
Notice of Department Assignment
January 13, 2022
Docket Event
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) (DV-110) on Domestic Violence Without Child(ren) filed by ARABELLA LUX SCHEUFFELE on 01/13/2022
January 13, 2022
Docket Event
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order (DV-100)
January 13, 2022
Docket Event
Proposed Order on Request to Continue Hearing (DV-116) on Domestic Violence Without Child(ren) filed by ARABELLA LUX SCHEUFFELE on 01/13/2022
January 13, 2022
Docket Event
Proposed Restraining Order After Hearing (DV-130) on Domestic Violence Without Child(ren) filed by ARABELLA LUX SCHEUFFELE on 01/13/2022
January 13, 2022
Docket Event
Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Domestic Violence Without Child(ren) filed by ARABELLA LUX SCHEUFFELE on 01/13/2022