Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Allison Fawn Tilton filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Timothy F. Freer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law Domestic Violence With Child(Ren) |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Proof of Service re: Petitioner's Trial Exhibits and Audio Files
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (CLETS) (DV-250)
Date: March 03, 2022Proof of Service re: Amended Petitioner's Trial Exhibits
Date: February 18, 2022Proof of Service re: Electronic Service - Amended Petitioner's Trial Exhibits
Date: February 18, 2022Request to Renew Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) (DV-700)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Response to Request to Renew Restraining Order
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Petitioner's Exhibits List
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service re: Petitioner's Trial Exhibits and Audio Files
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Formal Report on Guideline Support (XSpouse)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Custody/Visitation, Child Support, Spouysal Support, Property
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing via Remote Telephonic Appearance
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing on Domestic Violence With Child(ren) filed by ANAH MAI PHAM on 08/11/2020
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Child Custody Recommending Counseling Questionnaire
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00dvtro
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Confidential CLETS Information (CLETS-001)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order (DV-100)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.