Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Hedrick, Donald R, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions18 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent filed 9/3/19 Request for Child Custody and Visitation - For receipt of Mediation Recommendation. Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | VIP Temporary Agreement | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Respondent filed 9/3/19 Request for Child Custody and Visitation Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order. | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | RFO-OSC-MTN - (Custody or Visitation FC3170) | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF MAILING STIP FOR JDGMT S LATTEMORE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.