Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gordon, Bobby Wayne filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2013 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification Interested Party's Motion for Modification of Child Support and Health Care Filed 12/29/2021 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Rescheduling |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Motion as to Petitioner | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Motion as to Respondent | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Modification (DCSS Only) Notice of Motion for Modification of Child Support and Health Care |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AS TO PETNR / RESP MINUTES AND ORDER FLD 11/24/15 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HRNG DATE OF 11/24/2015 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (C10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN MOD C/S Desc2: FLD 10/16/15 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED;ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: NPA Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [DCSS] MTN MOD C/S Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: ARE 493 - $60.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.