Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Orange, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Koegel, Matthew Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2006 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING MIN/ORD M KOEGEL & N BRADSHAW Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD C/S, H/C, SET PYMT Desc2: ARREARS Desc3: FLD 1-21-15 Disp Code: 340 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF HEARING DATE OF 2/24/15 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING MTN ETC M KOEGEL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee MOTION MOD C/S, H/C, SET PYMT ARREARS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: MMC 493 - $60.00 |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING MTN ETC N BRADSHAW Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF STMT FOR REG & NTC RE PMNT OF SUPPORT ON CATHY SCANLAN & MATTHEW KOEGEL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (FC4200) (FORMER APP & ORD TO PAY THRU DCSS/BCFTF) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER & CLERK'S NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM | |
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement of Rights NTC OF REG OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.