Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2022 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-309) | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-309) | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-306) | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-306) | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing (FL-309) | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
October 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) Hearing Date: 10/14/2022 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Div: AHearing Date: 10/14/2022 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Div: A |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Response | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted by the Clerkby the Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.