Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sarmiento, Carolina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perez, Orlando, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Tafoya, Robert S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) 03/01/21 DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDERS INTERVENE 2 MINORS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) 03/01/21 DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDERS INTERVENE 2 MINORS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
April 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) 03/01/21 DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDERS INTERVENE 2 MINORS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) 03/01/21 DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDERS INTERVENE 2 MINORS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
March 15, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution (Default) MARITAL STATUS ENDS ON: 8/5/2021 Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution (Default) MARITAL STATUS ENDS ON: 8/5/2021 Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
March 12, 2021 | Hearing | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170) | |
March 12, 2021 | Hearing | Request to Enter Default | |
March 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion Re: DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDERS INTERVENE 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 04/20/21 Hearing Time: 8:00AM Hearing Department/Division:A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.