Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cervantes, Marilu, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Maciel, Luis, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Tafoya, Robert S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions684 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time513 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2019 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
April 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders Hearing of: 03/01/2019 Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders Hearing of: 03/01/2019 Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner Re: Determination of Debt owed to Respondent Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner Re: Determination of Debt owed to Respondent Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
February 08, 2019 | Hearing | Responsive Declaration | |
January 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice SENT VIA DCSS |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice SENT VIA DCSS |
|
January 08, 2019 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
January 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Re Payment of Support FILED BY DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.