Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Del One Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Savage, Lori E, against Hopkins, Symone Gabrielle, Hopkins, Symone G, Maker, Linda, Maker, Linda D, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with CONNER, MARK H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONNER, MARK H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2021 NOTICE |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 1, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER ON 4-30-21. IT IS ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS LINDA D. MAKER A/K/A LINDA MAKER AND SYMONE G. HOPKINS A/K/A SYMONE GABRIEELE HOPKINS AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL DEBT - $5,648.10; COURT COSTS - $218.75; TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT - $5,866.85. PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS - PAYMENT OF $250.00 TO BE RECEIVED BY 4-30-21 AND THEREAFTER 30TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66562911 ORDER |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT - MMT (JUDGMENT AMOUNTS DONE UNDER THIS ENTRY) DATE DOCKETED: MAY 1, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66562207 STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT SYMONE HOPKINS' ANSWER, FILED 4-19-21 PRO SE. THIS WAS REJECTED AND SHE WAS EMAILED AS IT WAS MISSING AN ORIGINAL SIGNATURE. THE CASE ENDED UP IN A STIPULATED JUDGMENT. WANTED TO MAKE THIS PART OF THE RECORD (JUST SCANNED IN) DATE DOCKETED: MAY 24, 2021 NOTICE |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 16, 2021 WRITS RETURNED ON 4-15-21. SERVED LINDA D. MAKER BY SERVING SYMONE HOPKINS, GRANDDAUGHTER, ON 4-13-21 (SERVED AT GRANDDAUGHER'S ADDRESS). SERVED SYMONE G. HOPKINS PERSONALLY ON 4-13-21.. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66516153 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE UPON LINDA D. MAKER ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66486605 WRIT ISSUED |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE UPON SYMONE G. HOPKINS ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66486605 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT - MMT (LORI E. SAVAGE) DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2021 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2021 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS - SUSSEX EXHIBIT A EXHIBIT B ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66466470 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.