Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aristil, Tiroro, Aristil, Elina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gill, Edward C, against Palmer, William, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with CONNER, MARK H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONNER, MARK H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 25, 2022 NOTICE OF PHYSICAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF WITH DR. PICCIONI ON 9-9-22, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67966324 NOTICE |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 19, 2022 LETTER FROM BRIAN CLAIRMONT TO COUNSEL. RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 14, 2022 AT 9:00 AM. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67946046 LETTER |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 6, 2022 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 8-5-22 ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67905385 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 6, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER ON 8-5-22. IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL ATTEND THE NEXT SCHEDULED MEDICAL EXAMINATION, FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN THIS MATTER BEING DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE IS EXTENDED 60 DAYS AFTER PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE AT THE NEXT SCHEDULED EXAMINATION. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67905401 ORDER |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 8-5-22 - MMT JUDGE MARK H. CONNER PRESIDING - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL WAS GRANTED, WITH NO SANCTIONS AWARDED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 5, 2022 MOTION GRANTED |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING ACCORDING TO ATTY. KUHL, AT LEAST FROM DEFT'S EXPERT DEADLINE FORWARD DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2022 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10-3-22 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / CONTINUED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL - MMT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2022 TRL SCHD: CONT RQST OF COUNSEL |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9-7-22 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / CONTINUED - MMT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 8-5-22 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / TO BE RE-NOTICED IF NECESSARY - MMT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2022 (THIS MOTION PUT BACK ON FOR 8-5-22, AS ATTORNEY DID NOT WANT IT CONTINUED, ONLY THE TRIAL) MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER ON 8-1-22. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 8-5-22 ARE GRANTED. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67887374 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.