Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Louder, Dianna E, against Higbee, Gregory, Holden Motors, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with CLARK, JEFFREY J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCLARK, JEFFREY J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 21, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: CLARK, JEFF SO ORDERED (VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66946529 ORDER |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 21, 2021 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66946445 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2021 SUBSTITUTE SERVED 05-03-2021 10:00 HOLDEN MOTORS, INC. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66574307 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2021 PERSONAL SERVED 05-03-2021 10:00 GREGORY HIGBEE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66574308 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2021 WRITS SIGNED AND COURT SEAL APPLIED. SENT TO KENT COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE ON 5-3-2021 FOR SERVICE ON HOLDEN MOTORS INC AND GREGORY HIGBEE. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66565246 WRIT ISSUED |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 14, 2021 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66507704 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2021 COMPLAINT PRAECIPE SUMMONS AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO RULE 3(H)(1)(II) PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66503631 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.