Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bowser, Barbara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Collins Ii, Robert C, against Universal Transportation Company, Chuks, Kingsley, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with PRIMOS, NOEL EASON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePRIMOS, NOEL EASON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: PRIMOS, NOEL EASON SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66710163 ORDER |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 23, 2021 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66701868 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2021 DEFENDANT CHUK'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66506196 ANSWER |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 30, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF PATRICK G. ROCK OF HECKLER & FRABIZZIO AS ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT KINGSLEY CHUKS WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66462315 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2021 PERSONAL SERVED 03-10-2021 10:00 KINGSLEY O. CHUKS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66419768 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2021 SUBSTITUTE SERVED 03-10-2021 10:00 UNIVERSAL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66419770 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2021 WRITS SIGNED AND COURT SEAL APPLIED. SENT TO KENT COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE ON 3-9-2021 FOR SERVICE ON KINGSLEY CHUKS AND UNIVERSAL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66402966 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 27, 2021 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S RULE 3H STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PRAECIPE SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66374827 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 27, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.