Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Medford, Cynthia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Day Jr., William L, against Lewis, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with PRIMOS, NOEL EASON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePRIMOS, NOEL EASON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 22, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: PRIMOS, NOEL EASON SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67744950 ORDER |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67727098 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2022 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 5, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT LEWIS' UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67206438 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 10, 2021 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ENTERING THE APPEARANCE OF GARY W. ALDERSON, ESQUIRE AND WITHDRAWING THE APPEARANCE OF WILLIAM L. O'DAY, JR., ESQUIRE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67155707 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67137688 NOTICE SRV OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (FIRST) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2021 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67137662 REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (1ST) |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2021 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67137662 DISCOVERY |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67137688 NOTICE SRV REQUEST PRODUCTION |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 16, 2021 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67017729 NOTICE SRV RSP RQST PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.