Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Oportun Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rodriguez, Elim, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wolf, David E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolf, David E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) |
|
February 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Wolf, David E. |
|
February 24, 2020 | Hearing | Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) | |
January 27, 2020 | Hearing | Proof of Service (SC-104) | |
January 08, 2020 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
January 08, 2020 | Hearing | Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) | |
January 08, 2020 | Hearing | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.