Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Oportun Inc. Fka Progress Financial Corp., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Velazquez, Elizeo Landeros, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wolf, David E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time177 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2017 | Hearing | Amended Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
January 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) |
|
January 18, 2017 | Hearing | Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) | |
January 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
November 30, 2016 | Hearing | Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) | |
November 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
September 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
August 02, 2016 | Hearing | Proof of Service | |
July 25, 2016 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.