Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Zendejas, Ana, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Tafoya, Robert S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTafoya, Robert S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections - Assignee Bp6322.1(C)(1) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Date: January 10, 2020Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)
Date: February 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full)
Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
March 28, 2019 | Hearing | Proof of Service of Summons | |
March 12, 2019 | Hearing | Declaration of Non-Service | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21) Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) |
|
February 01, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) | |
January 31, 2019 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
January 31, 2019 | Hearing | Statement of Classification and Location | |
January 31, 2019 | Hearing |
Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.