Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brk Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Potter, Dirk, against Ferguson, Lacy, Olsen, John, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 24, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions7 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time834 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JPM | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW OF PAYMENT STATUS Disp Code: 937 - DISMISSAL FILED Disp Clerk: DLG Filing Clerk: WJA Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLG | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Disp Code: 342 - CONT FOR FURTH HRG FOR PAYMENT STATUS Disp Clerk: WJA Filing Clerk: DLG Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Notice Date: 2013-06-26 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 01/10/2014 REQUEST OF ATTY Disp Clerk: DLG Filing Clerk: LNN Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL: OF DIRK POTTER RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: WJA |
|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LNN |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information POS OF MAILING OF ANSWER TO PLTFS ATTY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: RAD |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF SUMMS & COMPLAINT TO LACY FERGUSON Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KAD |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & CLERKS JUDGMENT **NOT TAKEN ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS ON 4/29/13 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KAD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.