Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Philip D Hampton, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brooke Hampton, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY BROOKE HAMPTON REPRESENTED BY MERCEDES E. BLUNT | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY BROOKE HAMPTON (RESPONSE OR OTHER FIRST PAPER FILED IN RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION SERVED ON ATTORNEY/FIRM ANITA GUMM BY MAIL ON 07/28/20 FILED | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF HAMPTON SERVED ON BROOKE HAMPTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/16/20 FILED | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 07/16/20 | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY PHILIP D HAMPTON (PETITION OR OTHER FIRST PAPER, INCLUDING A JOINT PETITION, FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.