Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tristan Elizabeth Hyde, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Justin Nicholas Hyde, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY TRISTAN ELIZABETH HYDE FILED ON 07/02/20 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - CHILD CUSTODY & VISITATION; RETURN OF MINOR CHILDREN TO VENTURA COUNTY; ETC FILED BY JUSTIN NICHOLAS HYDE FILED ON 07/08/20 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - CHILD & SPOUSAL SUPPORT, ATTORNEY'S FEES, PROPERTY CONTROL, TEMP USE OF 2019.. ETC, FILED BY TRISTAN ELIZABETH HYDE FILED ON 07/15/20 | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SET IN VENTURA | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS SET FOR 08/31/20 FILED BY JUSTIN NICHOLAS HYDE | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF JUSTIN NICHOLAS HYDE FILED | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JUSTIN NICHOLAS HYDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.