Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arlene Maribel Ocotecatl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jose Luis Ocotecatl Garza, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF OCOTECATL FILED | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 31 | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED AS TO ARLENE MARIBEL OCOTECATL | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | RESTORE FORMER NAME: NOT REQUESTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.