Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mayra Lara Santiago, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roberto Santiago Rubio, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER ON REQUEST FOR ORDERS FILED | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND CHILD SUPPORT, CLAIM CHILDREN ON TAXES FILED BY MAYRA LARA SANTIAGO FILED ON 12/17/19 | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF REQUEST FOR ORDER, I&E DEC, & BLANK FORMS SERVED ON MAYRA LARA SANTIAGO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/06/20 FILED | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS SET FOR 02/11/20 FILED BY ROBERTO SANTIAGO RUBIO | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF ROBERTO SANTIAGO RUBIO FILED | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND CHILD SUPPORT, CLAIM CHILDREN ON TAXES FILED BY MAYRA LARA SANTIAGO FILED ON 12/17/19 | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MAYRA LARA SANTIAGO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.