Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jessica B Detillio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anthony G Detillio, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with John R. Smiley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT'S RULING RE CCP 170.6 FILING (TIMELY) | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 31 | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | RESTORE FORMER NAME: JESSICA B GREENE | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | 170. 6 CCP FILED BY JESSICA B DETILLIO AGAINST JUDICIAL OFFICER JOHN R. SMILEY - FORWARDED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER JOHN R. SMILEY | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.