Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Ronaldo Aguirre, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED PER SERVICE LIST FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 05/22/19 | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIP FOR JUDGMENT SERVED PER SERVICE LIST FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 04/16/19 | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS AND JUDGMENT FILED | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT SERVED ON RONALDO AGUIRRE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/27/19 FILED | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 02/27/19 | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES # 200000002165209 | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.