Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ivan Rodriguez Aguilar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carlos Adolfo Gonzalez Mendoza, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions61 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time545 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 08/20/19 | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF AGUILAR AS TO CARLOS ADOLFO GONZALEZ MENDOZA | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 02/19/19 | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF AGUILAR SERVED ON CARLOS ADOLFO GONZALEZ MENDOZA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/19/19 FILED | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF IVAN RODRIGUEZ AGUILAR FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.