Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalo Rosete, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Veronica Mendoza, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO CCP 583.310 | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF VERONICA MENDOZA FILED | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VERONICA MENDOZA | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEC RE SERVICE OF DEC OF DISCLOSURE & INCOME & EXPENSE DEC, ETC SERVED ON GONZALO ROSETE FILED - DATE OF MAILING 08/27/19. | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RESPONSE-MARRIAGE/DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP SERVED ON GONZALO ROSETE FILED - DATE OF MAILING 07/29/19 | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VERONICA MENDOZA | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY VERONICA MENDOZA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.