Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Norma Leticia Macias, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rosendo Macias, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time540 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 07/01/19 | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF MACIAS AS TO ROSENDO MACIAS | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY NORMA LETICIA MACIAS | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NORMA LETICIA MACIAS | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 12/31/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.