Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura filed a(n) Statement case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryStatement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIP AND ORDER SERVED PER SERVICE LIST FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 04/08/19 | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER - CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 01/30/19 | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE SERVED PER SERVICE LIST FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 01/30/19 | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF TERI J LAMAIRE FILED | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 01/30/19 | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REGISTRATION STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF REGISTRATION SERVED ON ELDREDGE N CHONG, TERI J LAMAIRE FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 12/31/18 | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF OUT-OF-STATE SUPPORT ORDER - SUPPORT ORDER FROM WASHINGTON FILED | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER OF TRANSMISSION REQUIRING REGISTRATION FILED | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.