Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Annie Gill, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against James Gill, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with John R. Smiley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2017 |
CategoryPetition |
Time To Trial964 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions601 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2040 | Docket Event | **CASE REASSIGNED TO CR 32 RECUSAL BY JUDGE SMILEY** | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 2 DAYS 0:00 HOURS. | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS RE MODIFICATION - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & RETROACTIVE RE MODIFICATION FILED BY JAMES GILL FILED ON 06/11/20 | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (RE: RESCHEDULING OF 4/6/20 TRIAL DUE TO COVID-19 COURT CLOSURE) | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY JAMES GILL (REQUEST FOR ORDER, MOTION OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN A FAMILY LAW MATTER) | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS RE MODIFICATION - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & RETROACTIVE RE MODIFICATION FILED BY JAMES GILL FILED ON 06/11/20 | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF JAMES GILL FILED | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION SERVED ON ANNIE GILL FILED - DATE OF MAILING 05/05/20 | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S REQ FOR MODIFICATION OF TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT FILED BY JAMES GILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.