Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Megan Hernandez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fidencio Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time544 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 07/07/17 | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF HERNANDEZ AS TO FIDENCIO HERNANDEZ | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY MEGAN HERNANDEZ | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY MEGAN HERNANDEZ (PETITION OR OTHER FIRST PAPER, INCLUDING A JOINT PETITION, FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 01/06/17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.