Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Luis Carlos Hernandez-Nunez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2016 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time567 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SERVED PER SERVICE LIST - DATE OF MAILING: 11/14/17 | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER - CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SERVED ON LUIS CARLOS HERNANDEZ-NUNEZ, YOLANDA MARIE HERNANDEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 02/15/17 | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 12/08/16 | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE SERVED ON LUIS CARLOS HERNANDEZ-NUNEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 12/08/16 | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY YOLANDA MARIE HERNANDEZ | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LUIS CARLOS HERNANDEZ-NUNEZ | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY COUNTY OF VENTURA FILED ON 12/08/16 | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT SERVED ON LUIS CARLOS HERNANDEZ-NUNEZ, YOLANDA MARIE HERNANDEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/27/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.