Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dawn A Damart-Warshawsky, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gene J Warshawsky, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions973 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1835 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO CCP 583.310 | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 08/25/16 | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY GENE J WARSHAWSKY | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF DAMART-WARSHAWSKY AS TO GENE J WARSHAWSKY | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DAWN A DAMART-WARSHAWSKY | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS AND PETITION SERVED ON GENE J WARSHAWSKY; DATE OF MAILING 01/04/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.